Study guides

☆☆

Q: How do you use distributive property to multiply mentally 45 times 280?

Write your answer...

Submit

Still have questions?

Related questions

152

what is the distributive property of 44 times 60

distributive property of 220 times 8

the distributive property is something like 4(3+8) you would multiply 4 times 3+ 4 times 8

8*3.5 = 8*(3 + 0.5) which, applying the distributive property, = 8*3 + 8*0.5 = 24 + 4 = 28

The distributive property of multiplication over addition is that you can multiply the addends of a number times a number and add those together. 25 time 10=5*10+20*10

18

It is not the distributive property. The statement in the question is simply FALSE.

The distributive property involves two differentoperations - usually addition and multiplication in the same calculation.

60 x 44 = 60 x 40 + 60 x 4 = 2400 + 240 = 2640

22680 is the answer

12 times 14 = 12*(10 + 4) You could apply the distributive property twice and go for (10 + 2)*(10 + 4)

OWO

The distributive property is simple. What I do is think of a double rainbow... 5(3+2) = This will be simple. 5 times 3 is fifteen, 5 times 2 is 10. Now that you know about the double rainbow trick, visit math is fun for help with the distributive property.

19 * 14 = (20 - 1) * 14 = 20*14 - 1*14 = 280 - 14 = 266

You use the distributive property every time you use the standard multiplication method, whether mentally or with pencil and paper. In this case, 6 x 53 = 6 x (50 + 3) = 6 x 50 + 6 x 3.

35 x 3 = (30 x 3) + (5 x 3) = 90 + 15 = 105

Ooop

47

44 times 60 break up 44 into 40 and 4 then 60 times 40=2400 then 60 times 4=240 add 2400+240 it equals 2640

The distributive property refers to a property of TWO binary operations - usually of multiplication and addition - not just one operation. Consequently, 7*420 does not have a distributive property.

The distributive property states that when you have a problem, say 3(42-36) then you distribute the multiply by 3 to the 42 and -36 to get 126-108 which can be easier to solve some times. Also when you simplify problems with variables, you can substitute 5n+15 to 5(n+3).-------a(b+c) = ab+ac

To multiply a sum by a number,multiply each addend of the sum by the number outside the parentheses.For any numbers a, b, and c, a(b+c) = ab + ac and a(b-c) = ab - ac.Example: 2(5-3)= (2 times* 5) - (2 times* 3). Times*_multiply

2(x - 3) = 2x - 6.

(800x7)+(90x7)+(5x7) 5600+ 630+ 35 =6265