Best Answer

Here's how to do this in your head:

55 X 25 = (10 + 10 + 10 + 10 + 10 + 10/2) X 25 = (10 X 25) + (10 X 25) + (10 X 25) + (10 X 25) + (10 X 25) + (10/2 X 25) = 250 + 250 + 250 + 250 + 250 + 250/2 = 500 + 500 + 250 + 125 = 1250 + 125 = 1375

You can expand this method out to three, four, even five digit numbers, and if you practice enough, you'll soon be impressing all of your friends around the D & D table with your calculator-like brain!

If you know the FOIL method (First, Outer, Inner, Last) you can make this even easier. Pay attention because we're getting pretty advanced now:

55 X 25 = (50 + 5) X (20 + 5) = 50 X 20 (the first terms) + 50 X 5 (the outer terms) + 5 X 20 (the inner terms) + 5 X 5 (the last terms) = (50 X 10 X 2) + (50 X 10 / 2) + (5 X 10 X 2) + (5 X 5) = (500 X 2) + (500/2) + (50 X 2) + 25 = 1000 + 250 + 100 + 25 = 1375.

If you're comfortable with multiplying and dividing by 2, which you should be, what's written above takes approximately 5 seconds to do in your head.

Q: What is 55 multiplied by 25?

Write your answer...

Submit

Still have questions?

Continue Learning about Math & Arithmetic

Related questions

55 multiplied by 40 equals 2,200.

The numbers are: -25 and -30

1 x 275, 5 x 55, 11 x 25

248 multiplied by 55 is 13,640.

16 multiplied by 55 is 880.

3.5 multiplied by 55 is 192.5

55 multiplied by 14 is 770.

-13 multiplied by 55 is -715

25 multiplied by 5 is 125.

25 multiplied by 17 is 425.

25 multiplied by 200 is 5,000.

25 multiplied by 500 is 12,500