Study guides

☆☆

Q: What is the answer to 26 plus 3 using distributive property?

Write your answer...

Submit

Still have questions?

Continue Learning about Math & Arithmetic

453*26 = (400+50+3)*26 = 400*26 + 50*26 + 3*26 = 10400 + 1300 + 78 = 11778 If you do not know your 26 times tables, you could apply the distributive property to 26 as well: 453*26 = (400+50+3)*(20+6) = 400*20 + 400*6 + 50*20 + 50*6 + 3*20 + 3*6 Note that each term in the first bracket (parenthesis) must multiply each term in the second.

For example, you use it every time you do a multiplication. For example, in the following multiplication: 13 x 2 --- 26 Actually 13 is being split into two parts, 10 + 3, and then the distributive property is applied.

You don't need to use the distribution property, you can just multiply them. There is also nothing to distribute, so distribution simply cannot be done! The answer is 9464.

15x26=390

This is done by using a method called the distributive property. This is actually quite simple if we had x(y+z) we would distribute that xx, and get xy+xz. This is what we will use to solve this problem.If we take 6(5-2x) -4(3x+1) I have made the + sign bold, assuming that this is the symbol there.So next we'd use the distributive property and get 30-12x-12x-4.Now we would combine like terms, and get 26-24x.

Related questions

5*26 is 130. You don't need the distributive property for that! 5 = 10/2 So 26*5 = 26*10/2 = 260/2 = 130. Much simpler that way.

453*26 = (400+50+3)*26 = 400*26 + 50*26 + 3*26 = 10400 + 1300 + 78 = 11778 If you do not know your 26 times tables, you could apply the distributive property to 26 as well: 453*26 = (400+50+3)*(20+6) = 400*20 + 400*6 + 50*20 + 50*6 + 3*20 + 3*6 Note that each term in the first bracket (parenthesis) must multiply each term in the second.

For example, you use it every time you do a multiplication. For example, in the following multiplication: 13 x 2 --- 26 Actually 13 is being split into two parts, 10 + 3, and then the distributive property is applied.

You don't need to use the distribution property, you can just multiply them. There is also nothing to distribute, so distribution simply cannot be done! The answer is 9464.

That appears to be distributive. 2 x (4 + 6) = 2 x 4 + 2 x 6

15x26=390

This is done by using a method called the distributive property. This is actually quite simple if we had x(y+z) we would distribute that xx, and get xy+xz. This is what we will use to solve this problem.If we take 6(5-2x) -4(3x+1) I have made the + sign bold, assuming that this is the symbol there.So next we'd use the distributive property and get 30-12x-12x-4.Now we would combine like terms, and get 26-24x.

26 + 26 + 26 + 26 = 4 x 26 = 104

using the quadratic formula -4/3 and -0.4

The answer is 156. Simply add the numbers together like you would for two plus two. To check your work, a calculator is the best option. Another option is doing 26 multiplied by 6 where you aso get 156

26 plus 16 plus 84 is equal to 126.

1350