Q: How do you do long multiplication?

Write your answer...

Submit

Still have questions?

Related questions

this is short multiplication 7x6 this ls long multiplication 77x11

Multiplication problems can be solved by consulting a multiplication table. Large numbers can be multiplied using a technique called Long Multiplication. One can also use an electronic calculator.

Simple and Traditional multiplication. Then there is Long Multiplication. used for larger numbers. e.g. Simple multiplication 3 x 2 = 6 Long Multiplication. 33 x 22 = 33 x 22 660 66 726 ====

poop

I think its 104 because if you do 13 x 8 = 104 you will get that answer and also if you know your multiplication facts.

There are a few ways to determine if a multiplication fact is correct:Repeated addition: since multiplication is simply repeated addition at its base, you can reaffirm a multiplication fact by repeatedly adding the number you're multiplying. With the basic multiplication facts (i.e. times tables), this is possibly the best option.Division: Since it's simply the reverse of multiplication, then you can just reverse the process to confirm it.Using multiple methods: There are multiple ways to do multiplication than just the usual long multiplication done in school, such as lattice multiplication, and Ayurvedic multiplication (just to name the two I know). You can use these to confirm a multiplication.

122

This can be computed by long multiplication, or on a calculator 537 x 538 = 288906

use a calculator or long hand multiplication

Egyptians people who invented the Multiplication.Babylonians thousands of years ago.

Jenny

Long Multiplication 185 x22 3700 370 4070 The answer!!!!!