Q: How is a multiplying a three digit by two digit different?

Write your answer...

Submit

Still have questions?

Continue Learning about Math & Arithmetic

Multiplying by multi-digit numbers is similar to multiplying by two-digit numbers in that both processes involve breaking down the numbers into place values and multiplying each digit by each digit in the other number. The key similarity lies in the application of the distributive property, where each digit in one number is multiplied by each digit in the other number, and then the products are added together to get the final result. This process is consistent whether you are multiplying by a two-digit number or a multi-digit number.

1

yyutugugiuguyufuyfuf

find the diagonal method of two digit number and three digit number

The answer is 4. You get the answer by trying the example of the largest two digit number, 99. 99 x 99 = 9801. This has four digits, so you can't get more digits than this by multiplying two two digit numbers. * * * * * True, but you CAN have fewer: 10*10 = 100, which is only three digits! 1490 of the 8100 2 digit x 2 digit multiples have products of 3 digits, the rest have 4 digit products.

Related questions

They are the same because they are both multiplication. They also can be the same if the two digit number times by the one digit number equals a three digit number. They are different because the 3 digits number will obviously produce a higher product.

6 times

Four. (100 x 10 = 1,000)

Multiplying by multi-digit numbers is similar to multiplying by two-digit numbers in that both processes involve breaking down the numbers into place values and multiplying each digit by each digit in the other number. The key similarity lies in the application of the distributive property, where each digit in one number is multiplied by each digit in the other number, and then the products are added together to get the final result. This process is consistent whether you are multiplying by a two-digit number or a multi-digit number.

1

yyutugugiuguyufuyfuf

find the diagonal method of two digit number and three digit number

111 111 111 If you multiply 12345679 by any two digit number* where the first digit is less than 9 and the sum of the digits is 9 (eg 36), the answer will consist of a single digit repeated 9 times. This will be the first digit of the two digit number plus 1 (eg multiplying by 36 will create an number consisting of only the digit 3+1 = 4: 12345679 x 36 = 444 444 444). *Multiplying by 9 is multiplying by the "two" digit number "09", giving an answer consisting of the single digit 0+1 = 1 repeated.

11, 47, and 71

Multiply the three-digit number by the one's digit, or last digit, of the two-digit number. That is your first part. Now multiply by the second-to-last digit, or ten's digit, and multiply the result by 10. That is your second part. Add the two parts and that is your answer.

The answer is 4. You get the answer by trying the example of the largest two digit number, 99. 99 x 99 = 9801. This has four digits, so you can't get more digits than this by multiplying two two digit numbers. * * * * * True, but you CAN have fewer: 10*10 = 100, which is only three digits! 1490 of the 8100 2 digit x 2 digit multiples have products of 3 digits, the rest have 4 digit products.

No, when you add a two-digit number to another two-digit number, the largest sum you can get is 99 + 99 = 198, which is a three-digit number. In order to get a four-digit number, you would need to add at least a three-digit number to another three-digit number, such as 100 + 100 = 200.