Best Answer

A 3 or 4 digit number.

Q: What are the products of multiplying 2 digit numbers by 2 digit numbers?

Write your answer...

Submit

Still have questions?

Continue Learning about Math & Arithmetic

-1

Multiplication in general is important; not just 2-digit numbers.

3

The answer is 4. You get the answer by trying the example of the largest two digit number, 99. 99 x 99 = 9801. This has four digits, so you can't get more digits than this by multiplying two two digit numbers. * * * * * True, but you CAN have fewer: 10*10 = 100, which is only three digits! 1490 of the 8100 2 digit x 2 digit multiples have products of 3 digits, the rest have 4 digit products.

If multiplying 3 digit numbers with 2 digit numbers. For example; 345 x 92= First you will start with 2 by multiplying it by 5 then carry the 1 above the 4 then multiply the "2" with 4 then add the number on-top of the 4 which is 1 and it will give you 9. 4 x 2= 8+1=9. Then times the 2 by 3 which is 6. That is not your answer, yet. 690 plus the amount you get by multiplying 9 by every number, 5 then carry the number, 4 times 9, plus the number above it, then carry the 3 on top of the 3. Then add your total to 690 or what ever your equation is.

Related questions

-1

What is multiplying 2-Digit by 2-Digit numbers

6

Multiplication in general is important; not just 2-digit numbers.

3

The answer is 4. You get the answer by trying the example of the largest two digit number, 99. 99 x 99 = 9801. This has four digits, so you can't get more digits than this by multiplying two two digit numbers. * * * * * True, but you CAN have fewer: 10*10 = 100, which is only three digits! 1490 of the 8100 2 digit x 2 digit multiples have products of 3 digits, the rest have 4 digit products.

If multiplying 3 digit numbers with 2 digit numbers. For example; 345 x 92= First you will start with 2 by multiplying it by 5 then carry the 1 above the 4 then multiply the "2" with 4 then add the number on-top of the 4 which is 1 and it will give you 9. 4 x 2= 8+1=9. Then times the 2 by 3 which is 6. That is not your answer, yet. 690 plus the amount you get by multiplying 9 by every number, 5 then carry the number, 4 times 9, plus the number above it, then carry the 3 on top of the 3. Then add your total to 690 or what ever your equation is.

1

-2

The ones digit in the product from multiplying the 305 prime numbers less than 2012 is 0 because the ones digit becomes 0 after 2 and 5 have been multiplied and remains unchanged after more prime numbers are multiplied.

You have 4 options for the first digit, 3 for the second, 2 for the third. Multiplying all this you get 4 x 3 x 2 = 24 options.

There are 28706 such combinations. 5456 of these comprise three 2-digit numbers, 19008 comprise two 2-digit numbers and two 1-digit numbers, 4158 comprise one 2-digit number and four 1-digit numbers and 84 comprise six 1-digit numbers.