Q: What is 13 plus the product of 6 and a number is 67?

Write your answer...

Submit

Still have questions?

Continue Learning about Math & Arithmetic

the 13 is the whole number, the 67 is 67 hundredths, so it is 13 and 67 over 100

I guess you mean: What is the median of the numbers 71, 67, 67, 72, 76, 73, 68, 72, 72? (because adding the numbers would yield a single number). The median is the middle number when the numbers are listed in order. Listing in order: 71, 67, 67, 72, 76, 73, 68, 72, 72 ⇒ 67, 67, 68, 71, 72, 72, 72, 73, 76 There are 9 numbers, so the middle number is the 5th one which is 72. If there had been an even number of numbers, there is no middle one so the median is the mean average of the middle two. Example: If there had been no 76, so the list contained: 67, 67, 68, 71, 72, 72, 72, 73 then there would be 8 numbers, so the median would be the mean average of the 4th and 5th numbers, namely: (71 + 72) ÷ 2 = 71.5

13 x 67 = 871

67 plus 3 equals 70.

67

Related questions

the sum of 67 + 13 = 80

13 and 67 are prime.

the 13 is the whole number, the 67 is 67 hundredths, so it is 13 and 67 over 100

67 plus 13 = 80 80 divided by 8 = 10

67 plus 67 plus 67 is equal to 201.

67

67

If you mean 67*10 plus 10*10 then it is as a number 770 = seven hundred and seventy

I guess you mean: What is the median of the numbers 71, 67, 67, 72, 76, 73, 68, 72, 72? (because adding the numbers would yield a single number). The median is the middle number when the numbers are listed in order. Listing in order: 71, 67, 67, 72, 76, 73, 68, 72, 72 ⇒ 67, 67, 68, 71, 72, 72, 72, 73, 76 There are 9 numbers, so the middle number is the 5th one which is 72. If there had been an even number of numbers, there is no middle one so the median is the mean average of the middle two. Example: If there had been no 76, so the list contained: 67, 67, 68, 71, 72, 72, 72, 73 then there would be 8 numbers, so the median would be the mean average of the 4th and 5th numbers, namely: (71 + 72) ÷ 2 = 71.5

194

No, just these: 1, 13, 67, 871.

13*67=871871=13*67