Q: How do you use Distributive Property to multiply 15 x 95?

Write your answer...

Submit

Still have questions?

Continue Learning about Other Math

Say the Question is 3(2y+5) Multiply both terms in the brackets by 3 so (3x2y)+(3x5) = 6y+15

61

6x + 15

One way is: 15 * 104 = 15*(100 + 4) = 15*100 + 15*4 = 1500 + 60 = 1560

The distributive property states that when you have a problem, say 3(42-36) then you distribute the multiply by 3 to the 42 and -36 to get 126-108 which can be easier to solve some times. Also when you simplify problems with variables, you can substitute 5n+15 to 5(n+3).-------a(b+c) = ab+ac

Related questions

15*95 = 15*(100-5) = 15*100 - 15*5 = 1500 - 75 = 1425

You wouldn't. if it was something like 15(X-95) then you could use the distrubutive property but that is just a multiplication problem

An expression equal to 15 + 35, using distributive property, is 5(3 + 7). Under distributive property, 5*3=15 and 5*7=35.

It is not the distributive property. The statement in the question is simply FALSE.

Say the Question is 3(2y+5) Multiply both terms in the brackets by 3 so (3x2y)+(3x5) = 6y+15

The distributive property states that a(b + c) = ab + ac. This only works in your case if you meant to write 15(x + 20). That would equal 15x + 300.

61

6x + 15

There is no "distributive property" involved in this case. A distributive property always involves two operations, usually multiplication and addition. It states that a(b+c) = ab + ac.There is no "distributive property" involved in this case. A distributive property always involves two operations, usually multiplication and addition. It states that a(b+c) = ab + ac.There is no "distributive property" involved in this case. A distributive property always involves two operations, usually multiplication and addition. It states that a(b+c) = ab + ac.There is no "distributive property" involved in this case. A distributive property always involves two operations, usually multiplication and addition. It states that a(b+c) = ab + ac.

3(5 + 12)

One way is: 15 * 104 = 15*(100 + 4) = 15*100 + 15*4 = 1500 + 60 = 1560

The distributive property states that when you have a problem, say 3(42-36) then you distribute the multiply by 3 to the 42 and -36 to get 126-108 which can be easier to solve some times. Also when you simplify problems with variables, you can substitute 5n+15 to 5(n+3).-------a(b+c) = ab+ac