More answers

Lvl 1

127 mutiply with 32 in distributive property

Lvl 1

127(30)+127(2)

Lvl 1

gug

Q: What is the distributive property of 127 and 32?

Write your answer...

Submit

Still have questions?

Continue Learning about Other Math

The distributive property for multiplication states that when finding the product of a number and two or more numbers added in parentheses, you can multiply each number inside the parentheses by the number outside and add the products together. One way to write 32 * 9 according to the distributive property would be 32 * (6 + 3) or 32 * 6 + 32 * 3.

The distributive property is a characteristic that two mathematical operators may have. Numbers do not have a distributive property.

Numbers do not have a distributive property. The distributive property is an attribute of one arithmetical operation over another. The main example is the distributive property of multiplication over addition.

19

Individual numbers do not have the distributive property - mathematical operations do.

Related questions

The product of 127 and 32 is simply 127*32 = 4064

The distributive property is an attribute of two binary operations, not of individual numbers.

The GCF of 32 and 48 is 16. 32 + 48 = (2 x 16) + (3 x 16) = 5 x 16 = 80

8(3 + 4)

The GCF is 16.

The distributive property for multiplication states that when finding the product of a number and two or more numbers added in parentheses, you can multiply each number inside the parentheses by the number outside and add the products together. One way to write 32 * 9 according to the distributive property would be 32 * (6 + 3) or 32 * 6 + 32 * 3.

341 x 32 = (341 x 30) + (341 x 2)

There is none for that sum.

6x8 distributive property

The distributive property is a characteristic that two mathematical operators may have. Numbers do not have a distributive property.

Numbers do not have a distributive property. The distributive property is an attribute of one arithmetical operation over another. The main example is the distributive property of multiplication over addition.

(32 x 9) + (32 x 91) = 32(9 + 91) = 32 x 100 = 3200