Q: Write a definition for the the Associative Property of Multiplication in your own words and explain how you would use it to compute 4x25x27 mentally.?

Write your answer...

Submit

Still have questions?

Continue Learning about Math & Arithmetic

dont know about associative property but this one is easy in your head. 4x25=100x27=2700

Do the 2 x 50 first. Get 100. Multiply that by 14.

You can do the easy bits first. Thus, to calculate 7*5*2, instead of doing 35*2 = 70, you can calculate 7*10 = 70. By itself, the associative property is not as useful as it is in combination with the commutative and distributive properties.

The exact answer will depend on the details of the prism which is not shown!

The addition or multiplication of a set of numbers is the same regardless of how the numbers are grouped. The associative property will involve 3 or more numbers. The parenthesis indicates the terms that are considered one unit.The groupings (Associative Property) are within the parenthesis. Hence, the numbers are 'associated' together. In multiplication, the product is always the same regardless of their grouping. The Associative Property is pretty basic to computational strategies. Remember, the groupings in the brackets are always done first, this is part of the order of operations.When we change the groupings of addends, the sum does not change:(2 + 5) + 4 = 11 or 2 + (5 + 4) = 11(9 + 3) + 4 = 16 or 9 + (3 + 4) = 16Just remember that when the grouping of addends changes, the sum remains the same.Multiplication ExampleWhen we change the groupings of factors, the product does not change:(3 x 2) x 4 = 24 or 3 x (2 x 4) = 24.Just remember that when the grouping of factors changes, the product remains the same.Think Grouping! Changing the grouping of addends does not change the sum, changing the groupings of factors, does not change the product.*** 4x(25x27) = (4x25)x27***

Related questions

dont know about associative property but this one is easy in your head. 4x25=100x27=2700

Do the 2 x 50 first. Get 100. Multiply that by 14.

You can do the easy bits first. Thus, to calculate 7*5*2, instead of doing 35*2 = 70, you can calculate 7*10 = 70. By itself, the associative property is not as useful as it is in combination with the commutative and distributive properties.

use mental math

In general, the associative property cannot be used for this purpose. The volume of a prism is the area of cross section multiplied by the length, and except in the case of a rectangular prism, there is no scope for using the associative property.

The exact answer will depend on the details of the prism which is not shown!

5*2 is 10 and 10*17 is 170

Suppose you were trying to multiply 17 x 5 x 2. The associative property states that (17 x 5) x 2 = 17 x (5 x 2) The second one is easier to do in your head.

The addition or multiplication of a set of numbers is the same regardless of how the numbers are grouped. The associative property will involve 3 or more numbers. The parenthesis indicates the terms that are considered one unit.The groupings (Associative Property) are within the parenthesis. Hence, the numbers are 'associated' together. In multiplication, the product is always the same regardless of their grouping. The Associative Property is pretty basic to computational strategies. Remember, the groupings in the brackets are always done first, this is part of the order of operations.When we change the groupings of addends, the sum does not change:(2 + 5) + 4 = 11 or 2 + (5 + 4) = 11(9 + 3) + 4 = 16 or 9 + (3 + 4) = 16Just remember that when the grouping of addends changes, the sum remains the same.Multiplication ExampleWhen we change the groupings of factors, the product does not change:(3 x 2) x 4 = 24 or 3 x (2 x 4) = 24.Just remember that when the grouping of factors changes, the product remains the same.Think Grouping! Changing the grouping of addends does not change the sum, changing the groupings of factors, does not change the product.*** 4x(25x27) = (4x25)x27***

For example, evaluate 17*5*20: Method 1: (17*5)*20 = 85*20 = 1,700. Method 2: 17*(5*20) = 17*100 = 1,700. Notice that by first multiplying 5*20 to get 100, the calculation is easy to do in your head. You can also use the commutative property to rearrange a question: 5*21*4 = 5*4*21 = 20*21 = 420

Explain how you can use the commutative and associative prpoperties to add 19+28+81 mentally.

if you mean multiplication then 4x25=100 x 27 = 270