Q: Estimate each product: 9x47

Write your answer...

Submit

Still have questions?

Related questions

Ninja

ddd

36*.42=

There is no definitive answer for an estimation, so you could come up with something around 35000. The actual product is 35061.....

I think it means to do the work and then estimate it. But it could also be estimate the divisor and dividend and then do the work after those two numbers are estimated.

25x80 < 28x87 < 30x90 --> 2000 < 28x87 < 2700?

60 x 50 = 3000

3 x 5 = 15

find each product

In your example, the easiest way to estimate the product would be to round each factor to the nearest 10, 100, 1,000 or whatever the factors are. So, for 6,893 * 556, round to 7,000 * 600 to get an estimate. Since both numbers are rounded up, you know your estimate will be high, but this is an easy way to get a close answer. To be specific here, 7,000 and 600 would be multiplied to get 4,200,000. You multiply the first digits together, and then add the total number of zeroes in each rounded number to your answer.

if you subtract each product from the next larger product you will end up with a wrong answer

46.78-18.55 and estimate each sum or difference = 28.23