Q: What is the answer to how can you use multiplying by tens to find the product of 82x40?

Write your answer...

Submit

Related questions

if 29 x 6 = 174 and 29x 10 = 290 then the answer to 29 x 16 is made by adding up the answers to 29x6 and 29x10

5x5, 5x50, 5x500

The product of 10 tens is 100

37*4 = 148 which is 14 tens and 8 units

You cannot. You have to also use multiplication by 2 or 4 (or division by 5 or 25), or addition.

Consider the example 234 x 26.When multiplying out, you do the ones digit first, then the tens digit:ones: 234 x 6 = 1404tens: 234 x 2 = 468and then add the results together.However, the value of the tens digit is the_digit x 10. So in this example, the tens digit is not worth two (2) but twenty (20 = 2 x 10). Thus the correct value of multiplying by the tens digit is:234 x 2 x 10 = 468 x 10 = 4680(The correct sum is: 234 x 26 = 1406 + 4680 = 6084)So when multiplying by the tens digit there will be a zero (0) on the end.Similarly when multiplying by a hundreds digit there will be two zeros (00) on the end.To avoid forgetting to do this, the zero(s) is(are) normally written in first before doing the multiplication by the tens (hundreds, etc) digit.

Love is A being

14 and 8 units

The answer will depend on the order in which you do partial products. It is quite common in the UK for the first partial product to be the two digits in the tens' place and so that is often the largest. This ties in with the method for multiplying two binomials when they move on to algebra.

This is because we count in tens so that the place value of a digit is ten times the place value of the digit to its right.

37x7=148 therefore 14x10+8=148 is regrouped

This is because we count in tens so that the place value of a digit is ten times the place value of the digit to its right.

It is 2.

200 is.

The 3 is in the tens column, so it is thirty;Multiplying this by 1000 gives thirty thousand.

How would you regroup 4 tens to find the difference between 341 and 228?

when multiplying "to the power of" with tens, you just add up the zeros, so 10 to the fourth power would be 10,000.

The general function is:1. y = a*x+bb is irrelevant and we can be removed2. y = a*xlets split x into ones and tens3. x = tens*10 + ones /e.g. 23 = 2*10 + 34. p1 = Multiplier of the onesp2 = Multiplier of the tens5. y = tens*10*p2 + ones*p1 /according to the question6. x*a = tens*10*p2 + ones*p1 /according to 2.7. (tens*10 + ones)*a = tens*10*p2 + ones*p1 /according to 3.8. tens*10*a + ones*a = tens*10*p2 + ones*p1 /regroup9. tens*10*a - tens*10*p2 + ones*a - ones*p1 = 0 /regroup10. tens*10*(a-p2) + ones*(a-p1) = 0 /regroup11. assuming "tens" and "ones" are not 0 then (a-p2) and (a-p1) must be 012. a-p2 = 0a-p1 = 013. a = p2a = p114. a = p1 = p2the answer is: when the Multipliers of ones and tens are equal then the product is called a.

Tens.Tens.Tens.Tens.

400 10s are in 4000 :) :)

754 Piece of cake!

The value is 23,977 To find this number, start by multiplying the numbers by their wholes. 21 * 1,000 = 21,000 28 * 100 = 2,800 14 * 10 = 140 37 * 1 = 37 Now we add all of those numbers together. 21,000 + 2,800 + 140 + 37 = 23,977

an easy way to help you with your twelves multiplication table is to take the number your multiplying and times it by 2. example 6*12, 6*2=12 then add the number your multiplying to the number in the tens place. 126+72this works for numbers up to 9

There are 100 thousand or 100,000 tens in a million. To find this out just divide 1,000,000 (one million) by ten!!!

7