More answers

Q: What is the first partial product of 76 times 42?

Write your answer...

Submit

Still have questions?

Continue Learning about Math & Arithmetic

Related questions

(40 x 5) + (2 x 5)

Well, isn't that just a happy little math problem we have here! To find the partial product of 42 and 28, we simply multiply the two numbers together. So, 42 multiplied by 28 equals 1,176. Just like painting a beautiful landscape, math can be a peaceful and rewarding experience when you take it one step at a time.

The two partial products of 42 X 28 are 42 X 8 (336) and 42 X 2 (84). To get the actual answer, you shift the partial product (42 X 2) one decimal space to the left and add it to the other partial product, (42 X 8). 42 X 2 = 84. Now, shift 84 one decimal space to the left. This gives you 840. 42 X 8 = 336. Now add 336 to 840 to get the final result, 1176.

It is: 42*32 = 1344

The product is 294

42, idiot

The product is: 168

40 x 5 = 200 2 x 5 = 10 42 x 5 = 210

It is: 42 times 5 = 80

You do it like this. 6 times 7 times 2. 6 times 7 is 42. Then 42 times 2 is 84. You multiply the first number times the second number and then the product times the third number Example: 5x8x6 5x8=40 40x6=240 The answer to that problem is 240

The partial products are: 42 * 28 = (40 + 2)*(20 + 8) = 40*20 + 40*8 + 2*20 + 2*8 = 800 + 320 + 40 + 16

42 * 60 = (40 + 2) * 60 = 40*60 + 2*60 = 2400 + 120 = 2520