Q: How do you do 42 times 5 with partial product method?

Write your answer...

Submit

Still have questions?

Continue Learning about Other Math

The two partial products of 42 X 28 are 42 X 8 (336) and 42 X 2 (84). To get the actual answer, you shift the partial product (42 X 2) one decimal space to the left and add it to the other partial product, (42 X 8). 42 X 2 = 84. Now, shift 84 one decimal space to the left. This gives you 840. 42 X 8 = 336. Now add 336 to 840 to get the final result, 1176.

Well, isn't that just a happy little math problem we have here! To find the partial product of 42 and 28, we simply multiply the two numbers together. So, 42 multiplied by 28 equals 1,176. Just like painting a beautiful landscape, math can be a peaceful and rewarding experience when you take it one step at a time.

40 x 5 = 200 2 x 5 = 10 42 x 5 = 210

The product is: 5/8 times 5/7 = 25/42

6 times 7 = 42 and so 7 is the larger number

Related questions

To find the first partial product of 76 times 42, you would multiply the ones digit of 76 (6) by the ones digit of 42 (2), which equals 12. This gives you the first digit of the final product. The 1 is written in the ones place, and the 2 is carried over to the tens place.

The two partial products of 42 X 28 are 42 X 8 (336) and 42 X 2 (84). To get the actual answer, you shift the partial product (42 X 2) one decimal space to the left and add it to the other partial product, (42 X 8). 42 X 2 = 84. Now, shift 84 one decimal space to the left. This gives you 840. 42 X 8 = 336. Now add 336 to 840 to get the final result, 1176.

It is: 42*32 = 1344

The product is 294

Well, isn't that just a happy little math problem we have here! To find the partial product of 42 and 28, we simply multiply the two numbers together. So, 42 multiplied by 28 equals 1,176. Just like painting a beautiful landscape, math can be a peaceful and rewarding experience when you take it one step at a time.

42, idiot

The product is: 168

40 x 5 = 200 2 x 5 = 10 42 x 5 = 210

It is: 42 times 5 = 80

42 * 60 = (40 + 2) * 60 = 40*60 + 2*60 = 2400 + 120 = 2520

No. Prime factorization is the method of expressing a number as the product of prime numbers. So, Prime factorization of 42 = 2x3x7

Method of prime factorization: Expressing each number as the product of prime numbers.P.F. of 16 = 2x2x2x2P.F. of 42 = 2x3x7G.C.F.(16, 42) = 2