Best Answer

1 + 8 + 64 + 125 = 198. Did you mean to miss out 27?

Q: 1x1x1 plus 2x2x2 plus 4x4x4 plus 5x5x5 equals?

Write your answer...

Submit

Still have questions?

Continue Learning about Other Math

The first 5 cubed numbers are 1x1x1=1, 2x2x2=8, 3x3x3=27, 4x4x4=64 and 5x5x5=125. :)

28 is the non-cubic number The others work out like this - 2x2x2=8 4x4x4=64 5x5x5=125

1x1x1=1 2x2x2=8 3x3x3=27 4x4x4=64 5x5x5=125 6x6x6=216 7x7x7=343 8x8x8=512 9x9x9=729 10x10x10=1000 11x11x11=1331 12x12x12=1728 13x13x13=2197 14x14x14=2744 15x15x15=3375 16x16x16=4096 17x17x17=4913 18x18x18=5832 19x19x19=6859 20x20x20=8000 21x21x21=9261 use calculator to work out the rest cant be bothered to write out any more LOL :-)

5x5x5 5x5x5 5x5x5 5x5x5

5x5x5 equals 125 so that 3 fives used 125-5 equals 120 that's 4 used then 120/5 equals 24 that's 5 Done Easy as that Here's the equation ((5x5x5)-5)/5

Related questions

The first 5 cubed numbers are 1x1x1=1, 2x2x2=8, 3x3x3=27, 4x4x4=64 and 5x5x5=125. :)

1x1x1 = 1... 2x2x2 = 8... 3x3x3 = 27... 4x4x4 = 64... 5x5x5 = 125

1 cubed = 13 = 1x1x1 = 1 2 cubed = 23 = 2x2x2 = 8 3 cubed = 33 = 3x3x3 = 27 4 cubed = 43 = 4x4x4 = 64 5 cubed = 53 = 5x5x5 = 125

28 is the non-cubic number The others work out like this - 2x2x2=8 4x4x4=64 5x5x5=125

That depends on what you expect from the cube, like speed, stability etc. If you want a fast cube that is capable to cut corners very well, I'd suggest either a type AV or an F-II. Also the ShengShou and the Dayan ones are awesome. You can buy those cubes at Lightake, which is a popular and trusted speedcubing store or Amazon. Check the link below.

No. 64 is a cube number (4x4x4), 125 is the next one (5x5x5).

1x1x1=1 2x2x2=8 3x3x3=27 4x4x4=64 5x5x5=125 6x6x6=216 7x7x7=343 8x8x8=512 9x9x9=729 10x10x10=1000 11x11x11=1331 12x12x12=1728 13x13x13=2197 14x14x14=2744 15x15x15=3375 16x16x16=4096 17x17x17=4913 18x18x18=5832 19x19x19=6859 20x20x20=8000 21x21x21=9261 use calculator to work out the rest cant be bothered to write out any more LOL :-)

5x5x5 5x5x5 5x5x5 5x5x5

5x5x5 equals 125 so that 3 fives used 125-5 equals 120 that's 4 used then 120/5 equals 24 that's 5 Done Easy as that Here's the equation ((5x5x5)-5)/5

squaring a number is when you times it by itself. eg. 2x2 or 5x5 cubing a number is when you times it by itself and then times it again. eg. 2x2x2 or 5x5x5

It equals 125 5x5x5=125

5x5x5=535x5x5=125