Best Answer

The best trick for this is to think of averages. Put the 1 with 500, 2 with 499,, 3 with 488, ... On average these numbers are (1 + 500)/2 or 250.5 So you want to add up 500 numbers each of which is, on average 250.5 The answer is 500 x 250.5 which is 125250

Q: How do you add numbers 1 through 500?

Write your answer...

Submit

Still have questions?

Continue Learning about Other Math

-499

7,14,28,35,42,49,56,63,70,77,84,91,98,105,112,119,126,133,140,147,154,161,168,175, 182,189,196,203,210,217 hey please add 7 after 217 and 7 after it.. you'll get the numbers..

The sum of the first 500 counting numbers (1-500) is 125,001.

There's a trick to this one. Let 1 + 2 + ... + 500 be the sum of all integers 1 to 500, called X Now, imagine we want to add the sum the integers from 1 to 500 and to the sum of the integers from 1 to 500. This would give us 2*X we can write it as 1 + 2 + ... + 500 + 1 + 2 + ... + 500 But that's not particularly useful. What if we look at it as: 1 + 2 + ... + 499 + 500 + 500 + 499 + ... + 2 + 1 adding the numbers that are directly on top of each other, we get 500 + 1 = 501, 499 + 2 = 501... 1 + 500 = 501 Thus every term is 501, and we have 500 terms. So, we have 501*500 = 2X Thus X, the sum from 1 to 500, is (500*501)/2 = 125,250

There are 232 numbers between 1 and 500 that are divisible by 3 or 5.

Related questions

-499

500

Sum of first n numbers = n/2(n +1) = 500 x 1001 = 500500

Add them up.

7,14,28,35,42,49,56,63,70,77,84,91,98,105,112,119,126,133,140,147,154,161,168,175, 182,189,196,203,210,217 hey please add 7 after 217 and 7 after it.. you'll get the numbers..

The sum of the first 500 counting numbers (1-500) is 125,001.

There are 63 numbers 1 to 500 that are divisible by six but not by eight.

There's a trick to this one. Let 1 + 2 + ... + 500 be the sum of all integers 1 to 500, called X Now, imagine we want to add the sum the integers from 1 to 500 and to the sum of the integers from 1 to 500. This would give us 2*X we can write it as 1 + 2 + ... + 500 + 1 + 2 + ... + 500 But that's not particularly useful. What if we look at it as: 1 + 2 + ... + 499 + 500 + 500 + 499 + ... + 2 + 1 adding the numbers that are directly on top of each other, we get 500 + 1 = 501, 499 + 2 = 501... 1 + 500 = 501 Thus every term is 501, and we have 500 terms. So, we have 501*500 = 2X Thus X, the sum from 1 to 500, is (500*501)/2 = 125,250

if you add 1+1 it = 2 get it :D

1 000 500

There are 232 numbers between 1 and 500 that are divisible by 3 or 5.

500.5 Because: 1+2+3+.......998+999+1000 Add 1 to 1000 equaling 1001. This makes a pair. There are 500 more of these so 500 pairs. So 1001x500= 500500 Finally divide it by 1000 because there are 1000 numbers. (1000-1=999+1=1000) Concluding the answer to be 500.5 :)