Best Answer

It depends on how competent at arithmetic you are.

The basic level is

38*54 = (30 + 8) * (50 + 4) = 30*50 + 30*4 + 8*50 + 8*4

= 1500 + 120 + 400 + 32 = 2052.

Q: What are the partial products of 38 times 54?

Write your answer...

Submit

Still have questions?

Continue Learning about Other Math

38 x 54 = 2052

19 For partial-products you break the numbers up into different problems * 6 like 9 times 6, and 6 times 10, then you just add the two sums together ------------- to get the whole sum 9*6= 54 6*10= 60 60+54= 114

54

(35+54+7+64+54+38)/6 = 42

54 x 54 x 54 = 147,464

Related questions

What is it

38 x 54 = 2052

19 For partial-products you break the numbers up into different problems * 6 like 9 times 6, and 6 times 10, then you just add the two sums together ------------- to get the whole sum 9*6= 54 6*10= 60 60+54= 114

90 and 54

They are 1000, 80, 200 and 16.

54 - 38 = 16

54

2a+54=38 2a=38-54 2a=-16 a=-16/2 a=-8

(35+54+7+64+54+38)/6 = 42

The factors of 38 are: 1, 2, 19, 38 The factors of 54 are: 1, 2, 3, 6, 9, 18, 27, 54

38 + 16 = 54

92 - 38 = 54