Q: What are the partial products for 57 48?

Write your answer...

Submit

Still have questions?

Continue Learning about Math & Arithmetic

The partial products for 57 times 48 are: 48 multiplied by 7, which equals 336 48 multiplied by 50, which equals 2,400 Adding these two partial products together gives a total product of 2,736.

32 and 160

It is: (32*48) -57 = 1479

57 / 48 is equal to 1.19

57 inches. 4' = 48" 48+9= 57. Q.E.D.

Related questions

The partial products for 57 times 48 are: 48 multiplied by 7, which equals 336 48 multiplied by 50, which equals 2,400 Adding these two partial products together gives a total product of 2,736.

32 and 160

Single digits don't have partial products. 8 x 6 = 48

They are: 30*50, 30*7, 6*50 and 6*7.

48+57 =105

57 is 118.75% of 48.

It is: (32*48) -57 = 1479

The partial products for 734X29 are 6,606 and 14,680.

57 / 48 is equal to 1.19

The greatest common factor of 48 , 57 = 3

48 + 9 = 57

57 inches. 4' = 48" 48+9= 57. Q.E.D.