Q: What is partial products of 26 x 4?

Write your answer...

Submit

Still have questions?

Related questions

32 and 160

34 x 28 = 34 x (20 + 8) First partial product is: (30 + 4) x 8 = 240 + 32 Second partial product is: (30 + 4) x 20 = 600 + 80 Sum of partial products = total product = 600 + 240 + 80 + 32 = 952

how to find the partial products of a number

4 x 20 = 80 4 x 7 = 28 80 + 28 = 108 4 x 27 = 108

Partial products of 87 times 65 would be 80 x 60 and 80 x 5 and 7 x 60 and 7 x 5. Partial products allow for the multiplication of whole numbers.

30 x 20 = 600 30 x 8 = 240 4 x 20 = 80 4 x 8 = 32

700 and 210 are the answers to partial products of 77 times 30

You have to break it down into these multiplications: 80 x 70 = 5600 80 x 8 = 640 70 x 4 = 280 4 x 8 = 32 -------------------- 6552

29 x47=

90 and 54

Single digits don't have partial products. 8 x 6 = 48

4920 and 1476