Q: What are the partial products of 32 x 28?

Write your answer...

Submit

Still have questions?

Continue Learning about Math & Arithmetic

30 x 20 = 600 30 x 8 = 240 4 x 20 = 80 4 x 8 = 32

32 and 160

(8 x 60) + (8 x 4) 480 + 32 = 512

Partial products of 87 times 65 would be 80 x 60 and 80 x 5 and 7 x 60 and 7 x 5. Partial products allow for the multiplication of whole numbers.

Expressed as a percentage, 28/32 x 100 = 87.5 percent.

Related questions

34 x 28 = 34 x (20 + 8) First partial product is: (30 + 4) x 8 = 240 + 32 Second partial product is: (30 + 4) x 20 = 600 + 80 Sum of partial products = total product = 600 + 240 + 80 + 32 = 952

30 x 20 = 600 30 x 8 = 240 4 x 20 = 80 4 x 8 = 32

32 and 160

The partial products of 28 x 14 are 112 and 280. 28 = 8 + 20 ⇒ 28 x 14 = 8 x 14 + 20 x 14 = 112 + 280 14 = 4 + 10 ⇒ 28 x 14 = 28 x 4 + 28 x 10 = 112 + 280 The partial products are the same in the different splits as 28 = 2 x 14. If the numbers had been, say, 17 x 28 then: 28 = 8 + 20 ⇒ 28 x 17 = 8 x 17 + 20 x 17 = 136 + 340 17 = 7 + 10 ⇒ 28 x 17 = 28 x 7 + 28 x 10 = 196 + 280

4 x 20 = 80 4 x 7 = 28 80 + 28 = 108 4 x 27 = 108

how to find the partial products of a number

The two partial products of 42 X 28 are 42 X 8 (336) and 42 X 2 (84). To get the actual answer, you shift the partial product (42 X 2) one decimal space to the left and add it to the other partial product, (42 X 8). 42 X 2 = 84. Now, shift 84 one decimal space to the left. This gives you 840. 42 X 8 = 336. Now add 336 to 840 to get the final result, 1176.

(8 x 60) + (8 x 4) 480 + 32 = 512

20 x 40 = 800 8 x 40 = 320 3 x 20 = 60 3 x 8 = 24

Partial products of 87 times 65 would be 80 x 60 and 80 x 5 and 7 x 60 and 7 x 5. Partial products allow for the multiplication of whole numbers.

The partial products are: 42 * 28 = (40 + 2)*(20 + 8) = 40*20 + 40*8 + 2*20 + 2*8 = 800 + 320 + 40 + 16

700 and 210 are the answers to partial products of 77 times 30