Q: What are the partial products of 43 x 28?

Write your answer...

Submit

Still have questions?

Continue Learning about Math & Arithmetic

They are: 30*20, 30*8, 2*20 and 2*8.

30 x 20 = 600 30 x 8 = 240 4 x 20 = 80 4 x 8 = 32

Partial products of 87 times 65 would be 80 x 60 and 80 x 5 and 7 x 60 and 7 x 5. Partial products allow for the multiplication of whole numbers.

32 and 160

2x + 15 = 8x + 43 -6x = 28 x = -6 / 28 = -3 / 14

Related questions

20 x 40 = 800 8 x 40 = 320 3 x 20 = 60 3 x 8 = 24

The partial products of 28 x 14 are 112 and 280. 28 = 8 + 20 ⇒ 28 x 14 = 8 x 14 + 20 x 14 = 112 + 280 14 = 4 + 10 ⇒ 28 x 14 = 28 x 4 + 28 x 10 = 112 + 280 The partial products are the same in the different splits as 28 = 2 x 14. If the numbers had been, say, 17 x 28 then: 28 = 8 + 20 ⇒ 28 x 17 = 8 x 17 + 20 x 17 = 136 + 340 17 = 7 + 10 ⇒ 28 x 17 = 28 x 7 + 28 x 10 = 196 + 280

34 x 28 = 34 x (20 + 8) First partial product is: (30 + 4) x 8 = 240 + 32 Second partial product is: (30 + 4) x 20 = 600 + 80 Sum of partial products = total product = 600 + 240 + 80 + 32 = 952

60 x 40 = 2400 8 x 40 = 320 60 x 3 = 180 8 x 3 = 24 68 x 43 = 2924

4 x 20 = 80 4 x 7 = 28 80 + 28 = 108 4 x 27 = 108

60 x 40 = 2400 60 x 3 = 180 8 x 40 = 320 8 x 3 = 24

how to find the partial products of a number

They are: 30*20, 30*8, 2*20 and 2*8.

43 x 28 = 1204

The two partial products of 42 X 28 are 42 X 8 (336) and 42 X 2 (84). To get the actual answer, you shift the partial product (42 X 2) one decimal space to the left and add it to the other partial product, (42 X 8). 42 X 2 = 84. Now, shift 84 one decimal space to the left. This gives you 840. 42 X 8 = 336. Now add 336 to 840 to get the final result, 1176.

30 x 20 = 600 30 x 8 = 240 4 x 20 = 80 4 x 8 = 32

Partial products of 87 times 65 would be 80 x 60 and 80 x 5 and 7 x 60 and 7 x 5. Partial products allow for the multiplication of whole numbers.